MD HB1390 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on dwellings in Baltimore City that are owned by low-income employees of Baltimore City who are employed on a full-time basis, are among the 25% lowest-paid city employees, and who own a dwelling in Baltimore City; providing that the credit may not exceed the lesser of $2,500 per dwelling or the amount of property tax imposed on the dwelling; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Sponsors
Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Tony Bridges [D] |
Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Nick Mosby [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Public Employees
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Public Employees
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local