MD HB1396 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the owner of a residential high-rise building to provide a specified notice to individuals who are mobility impaired of the right to request specified rental units when specified units in the building become available.
Title
Fire Safety - High-Rise Buildings - Mobility Impaired Individuals
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Hattie Harrison [D] |
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Ruth Kirk [D] | Del. Brian McHale [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (127-7) | |
2010-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Environmental Matters |