MD HB140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and related costs to the parent of a child with a disability who is the prevailing party in a special education proceeding; prohibiting a court from awarding attorney's fees and certain related costs to a certain parent in a certain proceeding under certain circumstances; authorizing a court to award reasonable expert witness fees to the parent of a child with a disability who is the prevailing part in a certain special education proceeding; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {825167/2 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback