MD HB1400 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a physician designated by the State Anatomy Board to complete a certificate of death under certain circumstances; requiring a certain physician to enter certain information in a certain section of a death certificate; and requiring the State Anatomy Board to send to the Secretary of Health a report of the cause of death for entry on a certain death certificate if the State Anatomy Board receives information about the cause of death from certain individuals.
Title
Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558 |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |