MD HB1401 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Garrett County an art establishment license, a Class C beer and wine street festival license, the Garrett County Beer and Wine Festival, a beer and wine festival license, and a Class BWLT beer, wine, and liquor tasting license; adding a certain person to the list of persons to whom a beer festival license may be issued; altering a certain residency requirement; establishing certain license fees; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-0) (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-0) (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383790/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Education
Fairs
Fees
Garrett County
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
News Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Education
Fairs
Fees
Garrett County
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
News Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Time