MD HB1405 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Director of Finance of Howard County, instead of the Clerk of the Circuit Court of Howard County, to collect the county tax on the recordation of an instrument of writing that conveys title to real property; and repealing a requirement that the Clerk of the Circuit Court pay to the Director of Finance the proceeds of the transfer tax in a certain manner.
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Howard County
Land Records
Public Officials
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Clerks of Court
Howard County
Land Records
Public Officials
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax