MD HB1407 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, altering, or requiring the distribution of certain revenue; specifying that the requirement to waive a certain fee for the filing of certain documents by certain business entities shall begin in fiscal year 2022; altering the cap for fiscal year 2020 from 0.5% to 0.225% on a certain adjustment to a revenue estimate relating to nonwithholding income tax revenues; requiring the budget books to include supporting data and the results of certain calculations used to calculate certain State education aid; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-31) (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-31) (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
2019-03-26HousePassed Enrolled
2019-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-26SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed (103-31)
2019-03-26HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-03-22Senate(Senators Griffith, Zucker and Serafini)
2019-03-22SenateSenate advisors:
2019-03-22SenateSenators King, Ferguson, Guzzone, Peters, and Edwards
2019-03-22SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-22SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-03-22House(Delegates Haynes, Reznik and Korman)
2019-03-22HouseHouse advisors:
2019-03-22HouseDelegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, B. Barnes, and Beitzel
2019-03-22HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-22HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-03-22HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-20SenateFloor Amendment {193929/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#6-11) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#1-5) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {839435/1
2019-03-19SenateSpecial Order until 3/20 (Senator King) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {839435/1
2019-03-18SenateLaid Over (Senator King) Adopted
2019-03-18SenateMotion to Suspend Rule 52 (Senator King) Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {839435/1
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (106-31)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#5-7) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {974167/1
2019-03-11HouseSpecial Order until 03/13 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {974167/1
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-01HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-28HouseReferred Appropriations
2019-02-28HouseMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
2019-02-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1407&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1407f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1407t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1407e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_16_hb1407e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1407_97416701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1407_83943501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1407_19392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1407_85312001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1407_67332801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1407.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1407_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-BRFA-House-Reprint.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-house-summary.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-BRFA-senate-reprint.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-senate-summary.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1407_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0456.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0727.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1407_67332801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-cc-summary.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0794.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0924.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/ag_letters/hb1407.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback