MD HB1409 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Director of Finance for Prince George's County to distribute certain proceeds from a marriage license fee to the Community Crisis Services, Inc.; requiring certain proceeds from a marriage license fee to be used to fund battered spouse shelters and domestic violence programs if the Community Crisis Services, Inc., changes its name or objectives or ceases to exist.
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Benson) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Community Facilities and Services
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Fees
Licenses
Marriage
Prince George's County
Reports
Victims
Community Facilities and Services
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Fees
Licenses
Marriage
Prince George's County
Reports
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |