MD HB1411 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget for each fiscal year an appropriation of $200,000 for the CASH Campaign of Maryland to provide outreach, education, and free tax preparation services to promote the financial capability of low-income individuals and families; and specifying that the appropriations may be used to provide free volunteer tax assistance, financial education, connections to high quality financial services, education for service providers, and outreach to low-income individuals and families.
Title
CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-7) (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-36) (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-36) (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-7) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-36) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {104160/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Education
Governor
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
Volunteers
Welfare
Budgets
Education
Governor
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
Volunteers
Welfare