MD HB1417 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Missing Persons to study best practices for conducting searches for missing persons and review the options for the establishment of a State Coordinator for Missing Persons to serve as a point of contact for the families of missing persons; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Missing Persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-03-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Emergencies
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Officials
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rescue Squads
Safety
Search and Seizure
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Emergencies
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Officials
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rescue Squads
Safety
Search and Seizure
State Police, Department of
Sunset