MD HB143 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of an "abandoned or sunken vessel", to mean one that has remained at a location for more than 60 instead of 90 days without the consent of the property owner; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to take an abandoned vessel into custody without providing a notice if it determines that the vessel poses certain hazards; requiring, within 15 days after taking custody of an abandoned vessel, the Department to send a certain notice to the last known owner and each known secured party of the vessel; etc.
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Senate Recede |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2020-03-18 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Lehman and clark01) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2020-03-18 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Lehman and clark01) |
2020-03-17 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2020-03-17 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {514933/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {240513/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB219 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 76
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Emergencies
Environmental Health
Governor
Health
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Safety
Time
Water
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Emergencies
Environmental Health
Governor
Health
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Safety
Time
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 8 | 721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |