MD HB143 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB912
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain taxpayers with federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year that is $6,000 or less to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain dependent children under certain circumstances; providing that the credit is equal to $500 for each qualified child; allowing certain taxpayers to claim a refund in the amount of any excess credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020, but before January 1, 2026; etc.
Title
Maryland Child Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-08-21 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB218 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
HB912 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
HB912 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 751 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0143?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0143f.pdf |