MD HB1432 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation and the Maryland Transit Administration to study the feasibility of using the navigable waters of the Chesapeake Bay as a water transportation network to link waterfront communities along the Chesapeake Bay; requiring the Department and the Administration to prepare an inventory of certain facilities on the Chesapeake Bay and to estimate the cost of implementing a certain network; requiring a certain report be made to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30, 2022; etc.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Chesapeake Bay
Marinas
Mass Transit
Piers and Docks
Ports
Prices
Reports
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Marinas
Mass Transit
Piers and Docks
Ports
Prices
Reports
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |