MD HB145 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the compensation for the Howard County Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board shall be the amount set by the Howard County Council.
Title
Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 6-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
Hearings
Howard County
Salaries and Compensation
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
Hearings
Howard County
Salaries and Compensation