MD HB145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide patients with a certain patient's bill of rights; requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide certain patients with an interpreter, a translator, or other accommodation to provide assistance to patients; requiring each administrator of a hospital to conspicuously post the patient's bill of rights on the hospital's website and in areas of the hospital accessible to patients and visitors; requiring the Department of Health to submit a certain report by January 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {967673/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {556389/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advance Medical Directives
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Data
Deaf Persons
Disclosure
Discrimination
Emergency Medical Services
Ethics
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
internet
Job Training
Language
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Notices
Patients
Photography
Pregnancy
Prices
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Reports
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Advance Medical Directives
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Data
Deaf Persons
Disclosure
Discrimination
Emergency Medical Services
Ethics
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
internet
Job Training
Language
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Notices
Patients
Photography
Pregnancy
Prices
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Reports
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology