MD HB1454 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting moderate income housing units from a certain tax; authorizing the governing body of Howard County to increase the rate of the transfer tax to support certain public purposes; requiring the Director of Finance of Howard County to collect and distribute in certain amounts transfer tax proceeds attributable to an increase in the tax rate to the county general fund to be used for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-5) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {505767/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Construction
County Councils
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Housing
Howard County
Indigent Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Poverty
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Urban Renewal
County Councils
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Housing
Howard County
Indigent Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Poverty
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Urban Renewal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Howard County | 20.300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Howard County | 20.301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Howard County | 20.304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |