MD HB1456 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the definition of "offshore drilling activity" to mean the exploration, development, production or transportation of oil or gas on or under the outer continental shelf; establishing that an offshore drilling activity is an ultrahazardous and abnormally dangerous activity; establishing that a person that causes a spill of oil or gas while engaged in an offshore drilling activity is strictly liable for certain damages; providing that provisions concerning a certain bond do not apply to a judgment in a certain civil action; etc.
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-21) (Y: 116 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-22) (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-21) (Y: 116 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-22) (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626 |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-21) |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment {423121/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {548173/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-22) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation |