MD HB1459 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the person operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of any other rules of the road provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that a person convicted of a violation of the Act may be fined up to $2,000 and must appear in court and may not prepay the fine; establishing additional penalties of participation in a motor vehicle safety course and up to 150 hours of community service; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Bicycles
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Emergency Services
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Injury
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Off-Road Vehicles
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Sidewalks
Time
Utilities
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Animals
Bicycles
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Emergency Services
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Injury
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Off-Road Vehicles
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Sidewalks
Time
Utilities
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 11 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 901.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |