MD HB146 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providng that in Frederick County the area in which alcoholic beverages may be consumed in the Weinberg Center for the Arts is anywhere on the licensed premises.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Weinberg Center License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 80 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-16 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB214 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 81
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Signatures
Special Events
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Signatures
Special Events
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |