MD HB1462 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education to be the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program; authorizing food service facilities to store and make available for administration auto-injectable epinephrine for individuals who are experiencing or are believed to be experiencing anaphylaxis when a physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB477 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Subjects
Certifications
Diseases
Education
Emergencies
Fees
Food
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Storage
Work, Labor and Employment
Diseases
Education
Emergencies
Fees
Food
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Storage
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 7A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 7A-06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-7A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |