MD HB1481 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the length of time a zero-emission electric school vehicle may be operated from 12 years to 15 years, unless it fails to meet the applicable school bus and motor vehicle safety standards.
Title
Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-10) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Education - Miscellaneous
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Safety
School Buses
Time
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Safety
School Buses
Time
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections