MD HB149 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the requirement that a ground lease holder notify the State Department of Assessments and Taxation of certain changes concerning a ground lease; authorizing a leasehold tenant or an interested party to submit to the Department certain documentation of the redemption of a ground lease if the ground lease is redeemed in a certain private transaction and the ground lease holder has failed to notify the Department of the redemption; and requiring the Department to update the online registry under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Ground Leases - Required Notifications - Private Transaction Redemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 82
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-21SenateReferred Rules
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property8706(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8707.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback