MD HB15 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning on January 1, 2020, to provide services for certain pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders under certain circumstances; requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain health insurance benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment of certain pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders; etc.
Title
Health Insurance – Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders – Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-11-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Medical Treatments
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Public Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Medical Treatments
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Public Health