MD HB1505 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the mileage at which the owner of a Class F (tractor) vehicle that has been in operation for not more than 5 years is required to have the vehicle inspected, maintained, and repaired to 35,000 miles; and altering the mileage at which the owner of certain Class E vehicles that have been in operation for not more than 5 years are required to have the vehicle inspected, maintained, and repaired to 50,000 miles, if the vehicles are zero-emission electric vehicles or fuel cell electric vehicles.
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1505 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Agriculture
Energy Matters
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Repair
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Renewable Energy Sources
Time
Towing
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Energy Matters
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Repair
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Renewable Energy Sources
Time
Towing
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 919 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 923 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |