MD HB151 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the vehicle excise tax credit for the purchase of certain plug-in electric drive vehicles to include the purchase of certain fuel cell electric vehicles; providing that the credit for a fuel cell electric vehicle may not exceed $3,000; changing the name of the Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council to the Maryland Zero Emission Vehicle Infrastructure Council; altering the membership and required activities of the Council; requiring the Council to issue an interim report on or before December 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Cars Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback