MD HB1514 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to take certain actions related to certain protections and remedies for certain employees; prohibiting a supervisor, appointing authority, or the head of a principal unit of State government from taking or refusing to take any personnel action or reprisal against an employee of the Department of Juvenile Services who discloses certain information to the Director of Juvenile Justice Monitoring or staff of the Juvenile Justice Monitoring Unit; etc.
Title
State Personnel and Pensions - Maryland Whistleblower Law - Department of Juvenile Services Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Disclosure
Job Training
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Job Training
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 6 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 5 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 5 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |