MD HB1525 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the pay scale for a certain physician position in a certain facility to be the same as the pay scale for a certain psychiatrist position; requiring certain nursing positions to receive a certain upward adjustment in their pay scales when there is an upward adjustment to the pay scales for initial appointments to certain positions; requiring the pay scale for security attendants at a certain facility to be at least equal to the pay scale for correctional officers; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] | Del. Gabriel Acevero [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] | Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Del. Jared Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB639 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Job Training
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Personnel
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Job Training
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Personnel
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 103.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1525?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1525f.pdf |