MD HB1534 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB269
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and improve access to urban-grown foods; establishing an Urban Agriculture Grant Fund to provide grants to nonprofit organizations in Baltimore City to implement the Program; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer the Fund; authorizing the distribution of up to $400,000 to the Fund for each of fiscal years 2022 and 2025; etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsors
Del. Melissa Wells [D] | Del. Dalya Attar [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Andrea Harrison [D] |
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Brooke Lierman [D] | Del. Sara Love [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] |
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {260418/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1534 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Food
Grants
Natural Resources - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Food
Grants
Natural Resources - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |