MD HB154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB992
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $10,000 to $25,000 the maximum amount of compensatory damages that may be awarded to an owner of a pet from a person who tortiously causes an injury to or death of the pet while acting individually or through an animal under the person's ownership, direction, or control.
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB292 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
HB992 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
HB992 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 11 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0154?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0154f.pdf |