MD HB155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the caps on the percentages of certain costs for the construction, acquisition, renovation, and equipping of community mental health facilities, addiction facilities, and developmental disabilities facilities for which State grants can be provided under the Community Mental Health, Addiction, and Developmental Disabilities Capital Program; increasing the caps on the percentages of certain costs for certain projects that may be covered by State grants under the Federally Qualified Health Centers Grant Program; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Construction
Developmental Disabilities
Equipment
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prices
Reports
Substance Abuse
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Construction
Developmental Disabilities
Equipment
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prices
Reports
Substance Abuse