MD HB155 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, instead of requiring, certain emergency services tax revenue in St. Mary's County that exceeds the budgetary needs of the emergency services providers to be used to reduce the emergency services tax for the next year.
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Tax Revenue - Authorized Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 84 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
St. Mary's County | 49 | 1B | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
St. Mary's County | 49 | 1E | (n/a) | See Bill Text |