MD HB1555 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, beginning on or after January 1, 2022, to require certain members of the command staff of the Police Department of Baltimore City to reside in Baltimore City; requiring a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to include a certain waiver, exemption, or 120-day grace period to begin residence in Baltimore City under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-5) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {664264/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB72 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Residency
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Residency
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Baltimore City | 16 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 2A | (n/a) | See Bill Text |