MD HB1564 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a peace officer, to the extent practicable, to notify a certain emergency facility in advance that the peace officer is bringing an emergency evaluee to the emergency facility; altering the individuals who may request that a peace officer stay with a certain evaluee; etc.
Title
Public Health - Emergency Evaluations - Duties of Peace Officers and Emergency Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Contracts
Emergency Medical Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Law Enforcement
Notices
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Work, Labor and Employment
Emergency Medical Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Law Enforcement
Notices
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 624 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |