MD HB157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to suspend a business or occupational license before holding an administrative hearing if the Administration determines that the license holder is in violation of certain used vehicle safety inspection requirements and that there is a danger of immediate, substantial, and continuing harm to the public if the license is continued pending a hearing; requiring the Administration to grant a hearing request on the license suspension within 7 days of the request; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Business or Occupational Licenses - Administrative Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 85 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Communications
Hearings
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Work, Labor and Employment
Hearings
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 15 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |