MD HB1575 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a criminal justice unit from presenting victims of sexually assaultive behavior with forms or verbal agreements purporting to limit the obligations of the criminal justice unit to the victim or limit the rights of the victim; prohibiting certain evidence from being introduced in certain court proceedings; authorizing victims affected by a violation of the Act to bring a certain action; requiring by January 1, 2021, each criminal justice unit to adopt a certain policy; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB807 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Subjects
Civil Actions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Evidence
Forms
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Criminal Law - Procedure
Evidence
Forms
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 929 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1575?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1575f.pdf |