MD HB1601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Human Services, to develop guidelines and offer training to assist schools with a trauma- informed approach for understanding and responding to an individual with symptoms of chronic interpersonal trauma or traumatic stress; and requiring the State Department of Education to distribute the trauma-informed approach guidelines to each local school system and to publish the guidelines on the Department's website.
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {725864/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Budgets
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Investments
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Investments
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
Telecommunications and Information Technology