MD HB1607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to pilot a management model where a juvenile services education program at a facility located in a county is operated by the county board of education; requiring the Program to begin in the 2019-2020 school year; requiring the State Department of Education to identify one juvenile services education program to participate in the Program; requiring a certain workgroup to make recommendations on the management and operation of juvenile services education programs; etc.
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {514039/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {855962/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Juvenile Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
Students
Teachers
Youth
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Juvenile Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
Students
Teachers
Youth