MD HB161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring Baltimore City to withhold from tax sale certain places of worship if the taxes on the property consist only of a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service; repealing the authority of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to sell properties to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service if the properties are also being sold to enforce another lien; repealing the certain authority to sell certain real property owned by religious groups or organizations; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {775066/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback