MD HB162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Including the Governor Harry W. Nice/Senator Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge, Sandy Hook Bridge, Brunswick Bridge, and Point of Rocks Bridge as subject to the provisions of the Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact; and making the Act subject to certain contingencies.
Title
Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {520314/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Bridges and Tunnels
Communications
Contracts
District of Columbia
Governor
Interstate Affairs
Notices
Reports
Towing
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Bridges and Tunnels
Communications
Contracts
District of Columbia
Governor
Interstate Affairs
Notices
Reports
Towing
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 25 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |