MD HB1628 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1515
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "taxable price" and "taxable service" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing the sales and use tax to impose the tax on certain labors and services; altering the rate of the sales and use tax; altering the percentage of gross receipts from vending machine sales and from certain sales of dyed diesel fuel to which the sales and use tax is applied; altering the rate of the sales and use tax applied to certain charges made in connection with sales of alcoholic beverages; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsors
Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] |
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2020-02-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1628 (Carry Over) 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Contracts
Education
Exemptions
Fuel
Fuel Tax
Grants
Gratuities
Health
Insurance
Prices
Recordings
Religion
Sales and Use Tax
Social Services
Taxes - Sales and Use
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment
Contracts
Education
Exemptions
Fuel
Fuel Tax
Grants
Gratuities
Health
Insurance
Prices
Recordings
Religion
Sales and Use Tax
Social Services
Taxes - Sales and Use
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1628?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1628f.pdf |