MD HB1630 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the James Proctor Scholarship Program at historically black colleges and universities; requiring each historically black college or university to apply funding from the Program to the tuition and fees of an enrolled student who is a resident of the State; requiring certain student financial aid to be applied first to tuition and fees; requiring each historically black college or university to administer the Program; authorizing the Governor to include an appropriation in the State budget for the scholarship program; etc.
Title
Higher Education - James Proctor Scholarship Program - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {175962/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Fees
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Appropriations
Fees
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition