MD HB1634 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "unfair or deceptive trade practice" to be "unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice"; providing the purpose of the Act is to support enforcement by and funding of the Office of the Attorney General and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to protect State residents when conducting financial transactions and receiving certain services; requiring the Commissioner to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the establishment of a student loan borrower education course; etc.
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-12) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-42) (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-46) (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-12) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-42) (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-46) (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-42) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-12) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {877771/1 Finance Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {877771/1 Finance |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {417178/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-46) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {233198/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Accountants
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budgets
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Corporations
Court of Appeals
Criminal Background Investigations
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Governor
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Notaries Public
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Prices
Public Officials
Reports
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Securities
Students
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Work, Labor and Employment
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budgets
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Corporations
Court of Appeals
Criminal Background Investigations
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Governor
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Notaries Public
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Prices
Public Officials
Reports
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Securities
Students
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Work, Labor and Employment