MD HB1634 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the State Superintendent of Schools be appointed with the advice and consent of the Senate; and prohibiting the appointment of an individual as State Superintendent if the individual is, or during the immediately preceding year was, a member of the State Board of Education.
Title
State Superintendent of Schools - Qualifications and Senate Confirmation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-37) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {195462/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2020-02-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1634 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Education, State Board of
General Assembly
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
School Administration
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Teachers
Time
General Assembly
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
School Administration
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Teachers
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 2 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |