MD HB1635 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain person to attach a copy of an order of the court establishing parentage to a certificate of birth under certain circumstances; requiring, for a birth involving a gestational carrier in which parentage is determined by a certain court, that certain information be entered on the certificate of birth and that the order of the court establishing parentage be attached to the certificate; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2020-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1062 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judiciary Health and Government Operations
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Health
Health, Department of
Identification
Jurisdiction
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Registration
Vital Records
Courts
Health
Health, Department of
Identification
Jurisdiction
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Registration
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1635?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1635f.pdf |