MD HB164 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the eligibility for a retirement allowance for certain members of the Judges' Retirement System who reach the mandatory retirement age required by Article IV, ยง 3 of the Maryland Constitution and have less than 5 years of eligibility service.
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | First Reading Appropriations |