MD HB164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose, composition, powers, and duties of the State Board of Master Electricians; changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the Board of Electricians; authorizing the Board to issue an apprentice license and a journeyperson license under certain circumstances; authorizing the Board to adopt a State electrical code; requiring a county to enforce the State electrical code or a certain local electrical code; etc.
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-02-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Elections, State Board of
Electricians
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Elections, State Board of
Electricians
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations