MD HB164 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a dealer in Harford County to sell, barter, deliver, give away, show, or offer for sale a motorcycle or a certificate of title for a motorcycle on Sunday.
Title
Harford County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 90 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-2) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383091/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Harford County
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Retail Sales
Time
Commerce and Business
Harford County
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 18 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |