MD HB1654 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the circumstances under which a broadband Internet access service provider may handle certain customer personal information in a certain manner; establishing a mechanism through which a broadband Internet access service provider may obtain customer consent to have certain personal information handled in a certain manner; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that if the State or a municipality provides broadband Internet services, they may not impose use restrictions that prohibit the exercise of free speech; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (86-46) (Y: 87 N: 47 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {553524/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (50-83) (Y: 51 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {713724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-83) (Y: 48 N: 84 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {753426/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-81) (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/2 (Delegate Frick) Adopted (88-46) (Y: 89 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {553524/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (50-83) (Y: 51 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {713724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-83) (Y: 48 N: 84 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {753426/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-81) (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/2 (Delegate Frick) Adopted (88-46) (Y: 89 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (86-46) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment {673429/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment {753426/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-81) |
2018-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment {553524/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (50-83) |
2018-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment {713724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-83) |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Frick) Adopted (88-46) |
2018-03-30 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663397/1 |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Commerce
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Identification
Notices
Privacy
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Commerce
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Identification
Notices
Privacy
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology