MD HB169 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the duties of the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services to include the examination and review of fatalities involving children under the supervision of the Department of Juvenile Services for the purpose of advising the Secretary of Juvenile Services; establishing that a prohibition against the disclosure of a court record pertaining to a certain child does not prohibit access to and confidential use of the court record by the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Duties and Access to Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-27SenateHearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-26SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback