MD HB169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB360
Note: Carry Over of previous HB842
Note: Carry Over of previous HB842
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the juvenile court to refer a certain matter to the Department of Juvenile Services for a certain informal adjustment if the time for a certain adjudicatory hearing has been waived and the petition is not the result of an unsuccessful informal adjustment; providing a certain exception to the requirement that the court hold an adjudicatory hearing; and requiring a certain petition to be dismissed if a certain informal adjustment is successfully completed.
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB169 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
HB842 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB842 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Courts
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Parents and Guardians
Petitions
Reports
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Parents and Guardians
Petitions
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0169?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0169f.pdf |